U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10988
  • Case Name: Salt Caves of Arkansas, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.