U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10986
  • Case Name: John J. Rodgers and Carissa R. Rodgers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Case Change]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Shorten Time]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Shorten Time]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.