U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-70926
  • Case Name: Nathan Thompson and Ashley Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Additional/Amended Notice of Claim Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.