U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70500
  • Case Name: Raymond Messick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Amended Meeting of Creditors Minutes (Ch 7)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.