U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70113
  • Case Name: Kenneth James Neider
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Memorandum of Returned Mail]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Dismiss Debtor (ONLY) (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Memorandum of Returned Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.