U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70064
  • Case Name: Jakala Godbold
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.