U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-bk-12813
  • Case Name: Terry Lemont Cobb and Denise Labet Cobb
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Approval]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.