U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10274
  • Case Name: Larry Zintel and Jennifer Zintel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Final Report (NFR)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Final Rpt-Acct-Asset (TFR)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Opportunity to Object/Respond]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Compensation (Application)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.