U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-14213
  • Case Name: Matthew Derek Suit
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion for Compromise Controversy]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Assets]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Request for Notice of Assets (Meeting Held)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Compromise Controversy (Motion)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.