U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10579
  • Case Name: Katelyn Jean Saunders
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.