U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10994
  • Case Name: Youree K Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Case Change]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.