U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70502
  • Case Name: Myron Ray Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.