U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70501
  • Case Name: Maya Longino
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.