U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-bk-70750
  • Case Name: Madison B Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Meeting of Creditors Minutes (Ch 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Discharge of Ch 13 Trustee]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Ch 13 Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.