U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11009
  • Case Name: Jeremy Martin Youngblood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Shorten Time]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Opportunity to Object/Respond]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.