U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11008
  • Case Name: Courtney L Snelling, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Response to Motion/Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Shorten Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.