U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11004
  • Case Name: Jordan Rachelle Taylor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Continue Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Continue Meeting of Creditors (Motion)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.