U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70510
  • Case Name: Skylar Paige Akhtar
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Objection to Motion/Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [In Forma Pauperis/Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.