U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70065
  • Case Name: Christopher M. Trager
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.