U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70509
  • Case Name: Dana Michelle Todd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Amended Meeting of Creditors Minutes (Ch 7)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Withdrawal of Trustee Services Rendered]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Withdrawal of No Asset Report ONLY]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.