U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70508
  • Case Name: William Edward Rogers and Peggy Vincent Rogers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.