U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70507
  • Case Name: Morgan Danielle Burns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.