U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-bk-70286
  • Case Name: Jonathan Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Submit]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.