U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-bk-71970
  • Case Name: LaShunda D. Dickerson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.