U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-13583
  • Case Name: Christopher Ted Smith and Rachel Alyse Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction (Tr 13)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.