U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-13068
  • Case Name: Andrew Lee Neal and Destinee Jean Neal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Withdraw Final Report & Account]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Vacate / Set Aside]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Discharge of Ch 13 Trustee]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Vacate / Set Aside]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [13 Final Report and Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.