U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-11018
  • Case Name: Shemela Finesse Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.