U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11017
  • Case Name: Jeia Cowell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.