U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11021
  • Case Name: Julie A. Snyder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order on Application to Have Ch 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order Due]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [In Forma Pauperis/Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.