U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10531
  • Case Name: Donald Ray Via and Vicki O Via
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.