U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10520
  • Case Name: Charles Ethan Barda, 5th
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.