U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70514
  • Case Name: Michael Casey and Leanna Casey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.