U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-bk-72052
  • Case Name: Charles W Sumpter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.