U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-bk-70996
  • Case Name: Tracey Nickell Creel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order and Negative Notice Co-Debtor Stay (Chambers Only)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.