U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-11036
  • Case Name: Andre Demiris Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.