U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-10645
  • Case Name: Robert Nance Williamson and Nancy Pauline Williamson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Ch 13 Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Administrative Expenses]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.