U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70521
  • Case Name: John William Clark and Pamela Wannette Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.