U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-72082
  • Case Name: Jessie Ladoace Tramell, III and Jessica Carol Tramell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Sell]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Submit]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Sell]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.