U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-70314
  • Case Name: Norman Edward Brown and Mitzi LeAnne Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Assets]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Request for Notice of Assets (Meeting Held)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.