U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70519
  • Case Name: Theresa Lynn Meritt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.