U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-10272
  • Case Name: Minnie V Baker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Reinstate Case]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Shorten Time]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Reinstate Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.