U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10965
  • Case Name: Antranelia S Edwards
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.