U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-13430
  • Case Name: Larry Daniyell Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Assets]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Request for Notice of Assets (Meeting Held)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Declaration (Misc menu)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge (Tr 7)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Extend Time to Object to Discharge (Tr 7)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Declaration (Misc menu)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.