U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70525
  • Case Name: Amanda Rochelle Morgan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order to Submit]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.