U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70522
  • Case Name: James Darren Grubb and Tracy Lynn Grubb
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.