U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-12600
  • Case Name: Brittani Messer and Andrew Messer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Modify Plan (Tr 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.