U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70532
  • Case Name: Joseph Bradley Pierce
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.