U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-70531
  • Case Name: Kristina Savage
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held - Withdrawn]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Re: Claims]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Withdraw/Rescind/Terminate Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.