U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-70528
  • Case Name: Lana Nichole Cherry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.