U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11058
  • Case Name: Jeffery Earl Tacker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.